Create a story plan for your sci-fi story.
Include who attacked you, a plan of the attack and the aftermath.
This math video tutorial provides a basic introduction into long multiplication. it explains how to multiply multi-digit numbers.My Website: https://www.vi...
324 x 24 =
305 x 62 =
478 x 35 =
4132 x 65 =
32156 x 78 =
6502 x 9 =
Click here for more information.